Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB927 Latest Draft

Bill / Comm Sub Version Filed 05/03/2019

                            By: Hall S.B. No. 927
 (In the Senate - Filed February 20, 2019; March 1, 2019, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Natural Resources & Economic
 Development; May 3, 2019, reported adversely, with favorable
 Committee Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 6, Nays 5;
 May 3, 2019, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 927 By:  Rodríguez


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to exhibits presented at the Alamo complex.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter I, Chapter 31, Natural Resources
 Code, is amended by adding Section 31.4512 to read as follows:
 Sec. 31.4512.  EXHIBITS IN ALAMO COMPLEX. (a)  In this
 section:
 (1)  "Alamo complex" means the municipal and state
 property, whether owned or leased, consisting of and adjacent to
 the Alamo, including the Alamo Mission, the Alamo compound, the
 Alamo Plaza, the Plaza de Valero, and the Long Barrack.
 (2)  "Alamo compound" means the area of the original
 Alamo mission footprint contained within the walls of the mission
 as those walls stood in 1836.
 (b)  The land office shall ensure that each exhibit presented
 in the Alamo compound has as its primary theme the 1836 Battle of
 the Alamo. The exhibit must include information on:
 (1)  the lives of the individuals who defended the
 Alamo during the battle and the sacrifices made by those
 individuals for Texas independence and the freedom of Texans;
 (2)  the impact of the battle on Texas history and
 culture; and
 (3)  the pride felt by Texans with respect to the
 individuals who defended the Alamo during the battle.
 (c)  The land office shall ensure that an exhibit featuring a
 historical period or individual unrelated to the 1836 Battle of the
 Alamo is presented at a location in the Alamo complex other than the
 Alamo compound.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 * * * * *