Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB932 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 21, 2019

Engrossed

Bill April 17, 2019

Enrolled

Bill May 15, 2019

Comm Sub

Bill April 30, 2019
Bill April 11, 2019