Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB962 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 05/17/2019

                            S.B. No. 962


 AN ACT
 relating to the determination of the sufficient balance of the
 economic stabilization fund for the purpose of allocating general
 revenue to that fund and the state highway fund.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 316.092(e), Government Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 (e)  This section expires December 31, 2034 [2024].
 SECTION 2.  Sections 316.093(e) and (f), Government Code,
 are amended to read as follows:
 (e)  For the purposes of Section 49-g(c-2), Article III,
 Texas Constitution, the comptroller shall adjust the allocation
 provided by Section 49-g(c-1) of that article of amounts to be
 transferred to the fund and to the state highway fund under Section
 49-g(c) of that article in a state fiscal year beginning on or after
 September 1, 2035 [2025], so that the total of those amounts is
 transferred to the economic stabilization fund, except that the
 comptroller shall reduce a transfer made under this subsection as
 necessary to prevent the amount in the fund from exceeding the limit
 in effect for that biennium under Section 49-g(g) of that article.
 (f)  Subsections (a), (b), and (c) and this subsection expire
 December 31, 2034 [2024].
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 962 passed the Senate on April
 11, 2019, by the following vote:  Yeas 31, Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 962 passed the House on
 May 17, 2019, by the following vote:  Yeas 140, Nays 1, two
 present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor