Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB978 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
11 By: Hughes S.B. No. 978
2+ (In the Senate - Filed February 21, 2019; March 1, 2019,
3+ read first time and referred to Committee on Water & Rural Affairs;
4+ May 14, 2019, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
5+ Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 6, Nays 0; May 14, 2019,
6+ sent to printer.)
7+Click here to see the committee vote
8+ COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 978 By: Kolkhorst
29
310
411 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
512 AN ACT
613 relating to a study of the conversion of surface mine pits and
714 quarries to water storage reservoirs in order to enhance this
815 state's available water supply.
916 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
1017 SECTION 1. (a) The legislature shall establish a joint
1118 interim committee to study the conversion of surface mine pits and
1219 quarries to water storage reservoirs in order to enhance this
1320 state's available water supply.
1421 (b) The joint interim committee is composed of:
1522 (1) members of the Senate Natural Resources and
1623 Economic Development Committee appointed by the lieutenant
1724 governor;
1825 (2) members of the Senate Water and Rural Affairs
1926 Committee appointed by the lieutenant governor;
2027 (3) members of the House Natural Resources Committee
2128 appointed by the speaker of the house of representatives; and
2229 (4) members of the House Energy Resources Committee
2330 appointed by the speaker of the house of representatives.
2431 (c) The lieutenant governor or the speaker of the house of
2532 representatives, as applicable, may not appoint more than three
2633 members from a committee described by Subsection (b) of this
2734 section to the joint interim committee.
2835 (d) The lieutenant governor and the speaker of the house of
2936 representatives shall jointly designate a chair or, alternatively,
3037 designate two co-chairs from among the committee membership.
3138 (e) The committee may adopt rules necessary to carry out the
3239 committee's duties under this section.
3340 (f) The Texas Commission on Environmental Quality, the
3441 Railroad Commission of Texas, and the Texas Water Development Board
3542 shall provide administrative support and resources to the
3643 committee.
3744 (g) Not later than December 1, 2020, the committee shall
3845 prepare and deliver a report to the governor and the legislature
3946 that:
4047 (1) provides an overview of:
4148 (A) the lignite industry in this state and final
4249 reclamation practices of that industry; and
4350 (B) large sand and gravel producers in this
4451 state;
4552 (2) identifies surface mine pits and quarries that
4653 could potentially be used as water storage reservoirs and provides
4754 the following information for each location:
4855 (A) the volume of water that could be stored at
4956 the location;
5057 (B) the predicted water quality of a reservoir
5158 created at the location;
5259 (C) the predicted effect on watersheds
5360 surrounding a reservoir created at the location;
5461 (D) the sustainability of a reservoir created at
5562 the location;
5663 (E) the reclamation status of the location;
5764 (F) information needed to assess ownership
5865 issues at the location, including any constraint that the ownership
5966 of the property may impose on the use of the property as a
6067 reservoir;
6168 (G) a comparison of the estimated cost of
6269 converting the location into a reservoir and the estimated cost of
6370 filling in and regrading the location to the approximate original
6471 contour; and
6572 (H) the economic impact on communities near the
6673 location, including how revenue from the sale of water stored at the
6774 location could be used to promote economic development, trade or
6875 vocational schools, and health care in those communities;
6976 (3) contains a map of the locations identified under
7077 Subdivision (2) of this subsection;
7178 (4) provides a review of the regulatory issues and
7279 constraints associated with converting surface mine pits and
7380 quarries into reservoirs;
7481 (5) summarizes the effect that a statewide initiative
7582 to convert surface mine pits and quarries into reservoirs would
7683 have on state water resources; and
7784 (6) considers setback requirements and other
7885 restrictions on development to prevent shoreline development that
7986 would interfere with necessary withdrawals of water from surface
8087 mine pits and quarries that have been converted into reservoirs.
8188 (h) The committee is abolished and this Act expires January
8289 12, 2021.
8390 SECTION 2. This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
91+ * * * * *