Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB985 Latest Draft

Bill / Comm Sub Version Filed 04/30/2019

                            By: Kolkhorst S.B. No. 985
 (In the Senate - Filed February 21, 2019; March 1, 2019,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Business & Commerce;
 April 30, 2019, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0; April 30, 2019,
 sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 985 By:  Nichols


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to restrictions under disaster remediation contracts;
 creating a criminal offense.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Sections 58.001(1) and (2), Business & Commerce
 Code, are amended to read as follows:
 (1)  "Disaster remediation" means the removal,
 cleaning, sanitizing, demolition, reconstruction, or other
 treatment of existing improvements to real property performed
 because of damage or destruction to that property caused by a
 natural disaster.
 (2)  "Disaster remediation contractor" means a person
 who engages in disaster remediation for compensation, other than a
 person who has a permit, license, registration, or other
 authorization from the Texas Commission on Environmental Quality
 for the collection, transportation, treatment, storage,
 processing, or disposal of solid waste, but does not include an
 entity approved by the Internal Revenue Service as tax exempt under
 Section 501(c)(3), Internal Revenue Code of 1986.
 SECTION 2.  Section 58.003(b), Business & Commerce Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (b)  A disaster remediation contractor:
 (1)  may not require a person to make a full or partial
 payment under a contract before the contractor begins work, unless
 the amount of such payment is held in escrow with an escrow officer
 who meets the requirements of Section 2652.001, Insurance Code;
 (2)  may not require that the amount of any partial
 payment under the contract exceed an amount reasonably
 proportionate to the work performed, including any materials
 delivered; and
 (3)  shall include in any contract for disaster
 remediation services the following statement in conspicuous,
 boldfaced type of at least 10 points in size:  "This contract is
 subject to Chapter 58, Business & Commerce Code.  A contractor may
 not require a full or partial payment before the contractor begins
 work and may not require partial payments in an amount that exceeds
 an amount reasonably proportionate to the work performed, including
 any materials delivered."
 SECTION 3.  Section 58.004, Business & Commerce Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 58.004.  PENALTIES [DECEPTIVE TRADE PRACTICE].  (a)  A
 violation of this chapter by a disaster remediation contractor is a
 false, misleading, or deceptive act or practice as defined by
 Section 17.46(b), and any remedy under Subchapter E, Chapter 17, is
 available for a violation of this chapter.
 (b)  A disaster remediation contractor who violates Section
 58.003(b)(1) or (2) commits an offense.  An offense under this
 section is:
 (1)  a Class B misdemeanor if the offense was committed
 without the intent to defraud the person contracting for disaster
 remediation services; or
 (2)  a felony of the third degree if the offense was
 committed with the intent to defraud the person contracting for
 disaster remediation services.
 (c)  It is a defense to prosecution under this section if the
 disaster remediation contractor refunds any payment made in
 violation of Section 58.003(b)(1) or (2) not later than the 15th day
 following the receipt of a written demand alleging a violation of
 Section 58.003(b)(1) or (2) sent by certified mail to the disaster
 remediation contractor's last known business address or the address
 of the disaster remediation contractor's registered agent.
 SECTION 4.  The changes in law made by this Act apply only to
 a disaster remediation contract entered into on or after the
 effective date of this Act.  A disaster remediation contract
 entered into before the effective date of this Act is governed by
 the law in effect when the contract was entered into, and the former
 law is continued in effect for that purpose.
 SECTION 5.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 * * * * *