House | 05/06/2019 | Referred to State Affairs | ||
House | 04/30/2019 | Received from the Senate | ||
Senate | 04/29/2019 | Adopted | ||
Senate | 04/29/2019 | Read 2nd time | ||
Senate | 04/29/2019 | Record vote | ||
Senate | 04/29/2019 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | ||
Senate | 04/29/2019 | Co-author authorized | ||
Senate | 04/23/2019 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/16/2019 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/16/2019 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
Senate | 04/15/2019 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/15/2019 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/07/2019 | Read first time | ||
Senate | 11/12/2018 | Filed | ||
Senate | 11/12/2018 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |