03/21/2019 | Signed by the Governor | |||
03/13/2019 | Sent to the Governor | |||
House | 03/13/2019 | Signed in the House | ||
Senate | 03/12/2019 | Signed in the Senate | ||
Senate | 03/06/2019 | Reported enrolled | ||
Senate | 03/06/2019 | House passage reported | ||
House | 03/06/2019 | Adopted | ||
House | 03/06/2019 | Laid before the House | ||
House | 03/06/2019 | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar | ||
House | 03/04/2019 | Considered in Resolutions Calendars | ||
House | 02/21/2019 | Referred to Resolutions Calendars | ||
House | 02/20/2019 | Received from the Senate | ||
Senate | 02/19/2019 | Read & adopted | ||
Senate | 01/25/2019 | Filed | ||
Senate | 01/25/2019 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |