House | 05/07/2019 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 05/06/2019 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/06/2019 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | ||
House | 05/01/2019 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/01/2019 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 05/01/2019 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/23/2019 | Referred to Culture, Recreation & Tourism | ||
House | 04/18/2019 | Received from the Senate | ||
Senate | 04/17/2019 | Vote recorded in Journal | ||
Senate | 04/17/2019 | Adopted | ||
Senate | 04/17/2019 | Read 2nd time | ||
Senate | 04/17/2019 | Laid before the Senate | ||
Senate | 04/17/2019 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/15/2019 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/15/2019 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/15/2019 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | ||
Senate | 04/15/2019 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/21/2019 | Referred to Administration | ||
Senate | 02/21/2019 | Read first time | ||
Senate | 02/19/2019 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/19/2019 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |