04/18/2019 | Signed by the Governor | |||
04/09/2019 | Sent to the Governor | |||
House | 04/09/2019 | Signed in the House | ||
Senate | 04/09/2019 | Signed in the Senate | ||
Senate | 04/08/2019 | Reported enrolled | ||
Senate | 04/08/2019 | House passage reported | ||
House | 04/05/2019 | Adopted | ||
House | 04/05/2019 | Laid before the House | ||
House | 04/05/2019 | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar | ||
House | 04/04/2019 | Considered in Resolutions Calendars | ||
House | 04/01/2019 | Referred to Resolutions Calendars | ||
House | 03/05/2019 | Received from the Senate | ||
Senate | 03/05/2019 | Read & adopted | ||
Senate | 03/05/2019 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/05/2019 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |