Senate | 04/04/2019 | Co-author authorized | ||
Senate | 03/27/2019 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/27/2019 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 03/27/2019 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | ||
Senate | 03/25/2019 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/25/2019 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/25/2019 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/07/2019 | Referred to State Affairs | ||
Senate | 02/07/2019 | Read first time | ||
Senate | 01/10/2019 | Filed | ||
Senate | 01/10/2019 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |