Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SCR59 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 28, 2019

Engrossed

Bill May 1, 2019

Enrolled

Bill May 22, 2019

Comm Sub

Bill May 14, 2019
Bill April 26, 2019