05/21/2019 | Signed by the Governor | |||
05/13/2019 | Sent to the Governor | |||
House | 05/13/2019 | Signed in the House | ||
Senate | 05/13/2019 | Signed in the Senate | ||
Senate | 05/10/2019 | Reported enrolled | ||
Senate | 05/10/2019 | House passage reported | ||
House | 05/10/2019 | Laid before the House | ||
House | 05/10/2019 | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar | ||
House | 05/10/2019 | Adopted | ||
House | 05/08/2019 | Considered in Resolutions Calendars | ||
House | 05/06/2019 | Referred to Resolutions Calendars | ||
House | 05/03/2019 | Received from the Senate | ||
Senate | 05/03/2019 | Vote recorded in Journal | ||
Senate | 05/03/2019 | Read | ||
Senate | 05/03/2019 | Laid before the Senate | ||
Senate | 04/30/2019 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |