Texas 2019 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SCR62 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 05/17/2019

                    S.C.R. No. 62


 SENATE CONCURRENT RESOLUTION
 WHEREAS, Residents of Texarkana lost an admired civic leader
 with the passing of Martha Leah Williams Morriss on April 6, 2019,
 at the age of 92; and
 WHEREAS, The daughter of Jeffie and Isaac Williams, the
 former Martha Williams was born in Mount Pleasant on June 13, 1926,
 and grew up with two brothers, Bill and Jim; her family moved to
 Texarkana when she was 10, and after graduating from Texas High
 School, she completed her bachelor's degree in mathematics at
 Randolph-Macon Woman's College; on December 31, 1948, she married
 Joshua Rutland Morriss Jr., and they were blessed with three sons,
 Josh, Don, and William; and
 WHEREAS, Mrs. Morriss gave back to her fellow citizens
 through her support for many worthwhile organizations; she served
 as president of the Junior League of Texarkana, and she was
 instrumental in the founding of the Texarkana Regional Arts and
 Humanities Council; in addition, she generously shared her time and
 talents with the Texarkana Symphony Orchestra, the Literary Council
 of Bowie and Miller Counties, and numerous educational endeavors;
 widely admired for her contributions to the cultural scene, she was
 appointed to the Texas Commission on the Arts; together with her
 husband, she also played a key role in the establishment of MRC
 Cornerstone Retirement Community; and
 WHEREAS, The Texarkana Independent School District
 recognized Mr. and Mrs. Morriss for their exceptional efforts in
 behalf of education by naming the Martha and Josh Morriss
 Mathematics & Engineering Elementary School in their honor;
 moreover, in 2015 the district named the couple Distinguished
 Alumni and acknowledged Mrs. Morriss for her education advocacy and
 her work to benefit the TRAHC ArtSmart program, which brings the
 arts to schools; over the years, she was the recipient of myriad
 other accolades, including the C. E. Palmer Award for community
 service from the Texarkana Chamber of Commerce; and
 WHEREAS, For more than a half century, Mrs. Morriss taught
 the Fellowship Sunday school class at Williams Memorial United
 Methodist Church, and every summer, she organized Bible Storytime
 for Vacation Bible School; she served on the Perkins School of
 Theology Executive Board, and she and Mr. Morriss delivered Holy
 Communion to shut-ins together as well; and
 WHEREAS, Martha Morriss lived a rich and purposeful life
 centered on her family, her faith, and her community, and she will
 long be remembered with deep affection by all who knew her; now,
 therefore, be it
 RESOLVED, That the 86th Legislature of the State of Texas
 hereby pay tribute to the memory of Martha Leah Williams Morriss and
 extend sincere sympathy to the members of her family: to her
 husband, Josh Morriss Jr.; to her sons, Josh Morriss III and his
 wife, Diana, Don Morriss and his wife, Patsy, and William Morriss
 and his wife, Rita; to her grandchildren, Meredith and David
 Farren, Susannah and Daniel Linnett, Marjorie and Chad Matthews,
 Allison and Brady Wright, Whitney and Ross Ormond, Melanie and Ben
 Tkach, and Brad and Goodwin McCutcheon; to her 15
 great-grandchildren; to her special niece, Joan Baldridge-Ballard;
 and to her other relatives and friends; and, be it further
 RESOLVED, That an official copy of this resolution be
 prepared for her family and that when the Texas House and Senate
 adjourn this day, they do so in memory of Martha Leah Williams
 Morriss.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.C.R. No. 62 was adopted by the Senate
 on May 8, 2019, by a rising vote.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.C.R. No. 62 was adopted by the House
 on May 17, 2019, by a rising vote.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor