Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SCR62 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1-S.C.R. No. 62
1+By: Hughes S.C.R. No. 62
22
33
44 SENATE CONCURRENT RESOLUTION
55 WHEREAS, Residents of Texarkana lost an admired civic leader
66 with the passing of Martha Leah Williams Morriss on April 6, 2019,
77 at the age of 92; and
88 WHEREAS, The daughter of Jeffie and Isaac Williams, the
99 former Martha Williams was born in Mount Pleasant on June 13, 1926,
1010 and grew up with two brothers, Bill and Jim; her family moved to
1111 Texarkana when she was 10, and after graduating from Texas High
1212 School, she completed her bachelor's degree in mathematics at
1313 Randolph-Macon Woman's College; on December 31, 1948, she married
1414 Joshua Rutland Morriss Jr., and they were blessed with three sons,
1515 Josh, Don, and William; and
1616 WHEREAS, Mrs. Morriss gave back to her fellow citizens
1717 through her support for many worthwhile organizations; she served
1818 as president of the Junior League of Texarkana, and she was
1919 instrumental in the founding of the Texarkana Regional Arts and
2020 Humanities Council; in addition, she generously shared her time and
2121 talents with the Texarkana Symphony Orchestra, the Literary Council
2222 of Bowie and Miller Counties, and numerous educational endeavors;
2323 widely admired for her contributions to the cultural scene, she was
2424 appointed to the Texas Commission on the Arts; together with her
2525 husband, she also played a key role in the establishment of MRC
2626 Cornerstone Retirement Community; and
2727 WHEREAS, The Texarkana Independent School District
2828 recognized Mr. and Mrs. Morriss for their exceptional efforts in
2929 behalf of education by naming the Martha and Josh Morriss
3030 Mathematics & Engineering Elementary School in their honor;
3131 moreover, in 2015 the district named the couple Distinguished
3232 Alumni and acknowledged Mrs. Morriss for her education advocacy and
3333 her work to benefit the TRAHC ArtSmart program, which brings the
3434 arts to schools; over the years, she was the recipient of myriad
3535 other accolades, including the C. E. Palmer Award for community
3636 service from the Texarkana Chamber of Commerce; and
3737 WHEREAS, For more than a half century, Mrs. Morriss taught
3838 the Fellowship Sunday school class at Williams Memorial United
3939 Methodist Church, and every summer, she organized Bible Storytime
4040 for Vacation Bible School; she served on the Perkins School of
4141 Theology Executive Board, and she and Mr. Morriss delivered Holy
4242 Communion to shut-ins together as well; and
4343 WHEREAS, Martha Morriss lived a rich and purposeful life
4444 centered on her family, her faith, and her community, and she will
4545 long be remembered with deep affection by all who knew her; now,
4646 therefore, be it
4747 RESOLVED, That the 86th Legislature of the State of Texas
4848 hereby pay tribute to the memory of Martha Leah Williams Morriss and
4949 extend sincere sympathy to the members of her family: to her
5050 husband, Josh Morriss Jr.; to her sons, Josh Morriss III and his
5151 wife, Diana, Don Morriss and his wife, Patsy, and William Morriss
5252 and his wife, Rita; to her grandchildren, Meredith and David
5353 Farren, Susannah and Daniel Linnett, Marjorie and Chad Matthews,
5454 Allison and Brady Wright, Whitney and Ross Ormond, Melanie and Ben
5555 Tkach, and Brad and Goodwin McCutcheon; to her 15
5656 great-grandchildren; to her special niece, Joan Baldridge-Ballard;
5757 and to her other relatives and friends; and, be it further
5858 RESOLVED, That an official copy of this resolution be
5959 prepared for her family and that when the Texas House and Senate
6060 adjourn this day, they do so in memory of Martha Leah Williams
6161 Morriss.
62- ______________________________ ______________________________
63- President of the Senate Speaker of the House
64- I hereby certify that S.C.R. No. 62 was adopted by the Senate
65- on May 8, 2019, by a rising vote.
66- ______________________________
67- Secretary of the Senate
68- I hereby certify that S.C.R. No. 62 was adopted by the House
69- on May 17, 2019, by a rising vote.
70- ______________________________
71- Chief Clerk of the House
72- Approved:
73- ______________________________
74- Date
75- ______________________________
76- Governor