House | 05/23/2019 | Received from the Senate | ||
Senate | 05/22/2019 | Vote recorded in Journal | ||
Senate | 05/22/2019 | Adopted | ||
Senate | 05/22/2019 | Read 2nd time | ||
Senate | 05/22/2019 | Laid before the Senate | ||
Senate | 05/22/2019 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/21/2019 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/21/2019 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/21/2019 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | ||
Senate | 05/21/2019 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 05/21/2019 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/21/2019 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 05/15/2019 | Referred to Administration | ||
Senate | 05/15/2019 | Read first time | ||
Senate | 05/14/2019 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |