|
05/28/2019
|
Filed with the Secretary of State
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2019
|
Signed in the House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2019
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2019
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2019
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2019
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2019
|
Read
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2019
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2019
|
Record vote
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2019
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2019
|
Record vote RV#547
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2019
|
Adopted as amended
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2019
|
Amended 1-Cyrier
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2019
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2019
|
Laid out in lieu of companion HJR 39
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2019
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2019
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2019
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2019
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2019
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2019
|
Referred to Appropriations
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2019
|
Read first time
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2019
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2019
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2019
|
Passed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2019
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2019
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2019
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2019
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2019
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2019
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2019
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2019
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2019
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2019
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2019
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2019
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2019
|
Referred to Finance
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/20/2018
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/20/2018
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|