Texas 2019 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SJR24 Engrossed / Bill

Filed 04/10/2019

                    By: Kolkhorst, et al. S.J.R. No. 24
 SENATE JOINT RESOLUTION


 proposing a constitutional amendment relating to the appropriation
 of the net revenue received from the imposition of state sales and
 use taxes on sporting goods.
 BE IT RESOLVED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Article VIII, Texas Constitution, is amended by
 adding Section 7-d to read as follows:
 Sec. 7-d.  (a)  For each state fiscal year, the net revenue
 received from the collection of any state taxes imposed on the sale,
 storage, use, or other consumption in this state of sporting goods
 that were subject to taxation on January 1, 2019, under Chapter 151,
 Tax Code, is automatically appropriated when received to the Parks
 and Wildlife Department and the Texas Historical Commission, or
 their successors in function, and is allocated between those
 agencies as provided by general law. The legislature by general law
 may provide limitations on the use of money appropriated under this
 subsection.
 (b)  In this section, "sporting goods" means an item of
 tangible personal property designed and sold for use in a sport or
 sporting activity, excluding apparel and footwear except that which
 is suitable only for use in a sport or sporting activity, and
 excluding board games, electronic games and similar devices,
 aircraft and powered vehicles, and replacement parts and
 accessories for any excluded item.
 SECTION 2.  The following temporary provision is added to
 the Texas Constitution:
 TEMPORARY PROVISION. (a)  This temporary provision applies
 to the constitutional amendment proposed by the 86th Legislature,
 Regular Session, 2019, dedicating the revenue received from the
 existing state sales and use taxes that are imposed on sporting
 goods to the Texas Parks and Wildlife Department and the Texas
 Historical Commission to protect Texas' natural areas, water
 quality, and history by acquiring, managing, and improving state
 and local parks and historic sites while not increasing the rate of
 the state sales and use taxes.
 (b)  Section 7-d, Article VIII, of this constitution takes
 effect September 1, 2021, and applies only to state tax revenue
 collected on or after that date.
 (c)  This temporary provision expires January 1, 2022.
 SECTION 3.  This proposed constitutional amendment shall be
 submitted to the voters at an election to be held November 5, 2019.
 The ballot shall be printed to provide for voting for or against the
 proposition:  "The constitutional amendment dedicating the revenue
 received from the existing state sales and use taxes that are
 imposed on sporting goods to the Texas Parks and Wildlife
 Department and the Texas Historical Commission to protect Texas'
 natural areas, water quality, and history by acquiring, managing,
 and improving state and local parks and historic sites while not
 increasing the rate of the state sales and use taxes."