Senate | 04/15/2019 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/15/2019 | Co-author authorized | ||
Senate | 04/11/2019 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | ||
Senate | 04/11/2019 | Record vote | ||
Senate | 04/11/2019 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | ||
Senate | 04/08/2019 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/03/2019 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/03/2019 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | ||
Senate | 04/01/2019 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/25/2019 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 03/25/2019 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/14/2019 | Referred to State Affairs | ||
Senate | 02/14/2019 | Read first time | ||
Senate | 01/10/2019 | Filed | ||
Senate | 01/10/2019 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |