|
05/28/2019
|
Filed with the Secretary of State
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2019
|
Signed in the House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2019
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2019
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2019
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2019
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2019
|
Read
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2019
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2019
|
Record vote
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2019
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2019
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2019
|
Record vote RV#1587
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2019
|
Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2019
|
Placed on Constitutional Amendments Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2019
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2019
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2019
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2019
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2019
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2019
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2019
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2019
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2019
|
Vote reconsidered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2019
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2019
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2019
|
Referred to Natural Resources
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2019
|
Read first time
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2019
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2019
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2019
|
Passed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2019
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2019
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2019
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2019
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2019
|
Amended
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2019
|
Amendment(s) offered FA1 Perry
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2019
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2019
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2019
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2019
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2019
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2019
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2019
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2019
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2019
|
Referred to Water & Rural Affairs
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2019
|
Permission to introduce
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2019
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|