Texas 2019 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SJR79 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/23/2019

                    By: Lucio, Hinojosa, Perry S.J.R. No. 79
 (In the Senate - Filed March 20, 2019; March 27, 2019, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Water & Rural Affairs;
 April 23, 2019, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 7, Nays 0; April 23, 2019,
 sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.J.R. No. 79 By:  Creighton


 SENATE JOINT RESOLUTION
 proposing a constitutional amendment providing for the issuance of
 additional general obligation bonds by the Texas Water Development
 Board to provide financial assistance for the development of
 certain projects in economically distressed areas.
 BE IT RESOLVED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Article III, Texas Constitution, is amended by
 adding Section 49-d-14 to read as follows:
 Sec. 49-d-14.  (a)  In addition to the bonds authorized by
 the other provisions of this article, the Texas Water Development
 Board may issue general obligation bonds, at its determination and
 on a continuing basis, for the economically distressed areas
 program account of the Texas Water Development Fund II in amounts
 such that the aggregate principal amount of the bonds issued by the
 board under this section that are outstanding at any time does not
 exceed $400 million.  The bonds shall be used to provide financial
 assistance for the development of water supply and sewer service
 projects in economically distressed areas of the state as defined
 by law.
 (b)  The additional general obligation bonds authorized by
 this section may be issued as bonds, notes, or other obligations as
 permitted by law and shall be sold in forms and denominations, on
 terms, at times, in the manner, at places, and in installments, as
 determined by the Texas Water Development Board. The bonds shall
 bear a rate or rates of interest the Texas Water Development Board
 determines. The bonds shall be incontestable after execution by
 the Texas Water Development Board, approval by the attorney
 general, and delivery to the purchaser or purchasers of the bonds.
 (c)  Section 49-d-8(e) of this article applies to the
 additional general obligation bonds authorized by this section.
 The limitation in Section 49-d-8 of this article that the Texas
 Water Development Board may not issue bonds in excess of the
 aggregate principal amount of general obligation bonds previously
 authorized for the economically distressed areas program does not
 apply to the bonds authorized by and issued under this section.
 SECTION 2.  This proposed constitutional amendment shall be
 submitted to the voters at an election to be held November 5, 2019.
 The ballot shall be printed to provide for voting for or against the
 proposition:  "The constitutional amendment providing for the
 issuance of additional general obligation bonds by the Texas Water
 Development Board in an amount not to exceed $400 million to provide
 financial assistance for the development of certain projects in
 economically distressed areas."
 * * * * *