Texas 2019 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SJR79 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 05/26/2019

                    S.J.R. No. 79


 proposing a constitutional amendment providing for the issuance of
 additional general obligation bonds by the Texas Water Development
 Board to provide financial assistance for the development of
 certain projects in economically distressed areas.
 BE IT RESOLVED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Article III, Texas Constitution, is amended by
 adding Section 49-d-14 to read as follows:
 Sec. 49-d-14.  (a)  In addition to the bonds authorized by
 the other provisions of this article, the Texas Water Development
 Board may issue general obligation bonds, at its determination and
 on a continuing basis, for the economically distressed areas
 program account of the Texas Water Development Fund II in amounts
 such that the aggregate principal amount of the bonds issued by the
 board under this section that are outstanding at any time does not
 exceed $200 million.  The bonds shall be used to provide financial
 assistance for the development of water supply and sewer service
 projects in economically distressed areas of the state as defined
 by law.
 (b)  The additional general obligation bonds authorized by
 this section may be issued as bonds, notes, or other obligations as
 permitted by law and shall be sold in forms and denominations, on
 terms, at times, in the manner, at places, and in installments, as
 determined by the Texas Water Development Board. The bonds shall
 bear a rate or rates of interest the Texas Water Development Board
 determines. The bonds shall be incontestable after execution by
 the Texas Water Development Board, approval by the attorney
 general, and delivery to the purchaser or purchasers of the bonds.
 (c)  Section 49-d-8(e) of this article applies to the
 additional general obligation bonds authorized by this section.
 The limitation in Section 49-d-8 of this article that the Texas
 Water Development Board may not issue bonds in excess of the
 aggregate principal amount of general obligation bonds previously
 authorized for the economically distressed areas program does not
 apply to the bonds authorized by and issued under this section.
 SECTION 2.  This proposed constitutional amendment shall be
 submitted to the voters at an election to be held November 5, 2019.
 The ballot shall be printed to provide for voting for or against the
 proposition:  "The constitutional amendment providing for the
 issuance of additional general obligation bonds by the Texas Water
 Development Board in an amount not to exceed $200 million to provide
 financial assistance for the development of certain projects in
 economically distressed areas."
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.J.R. No. 79 was adopted by the Senate
 on May 8, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 21, Nays 10; and that
 the Senate concurred in House amendment on May 25, 2019, by the
 following vote: Yeas 22, Nays 8.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.J.R. No. 79 was adopted by the House,
 with amendment, on May 21, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 114,
 Nays 27, two present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Received:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Secretary of State