Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR140 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 02/07/2019

                            SENATE RESOLUTION NO. 140
 In Memory
 of
 Thomas E. Creek
 WHEREAS, The Senate of the State of Texas is proud to pay
 tribute to the life and legacy of Thomas E. Creek, who died in the
 line of duty on February 13, 1969, while serving the nation in
 Vietnam; and
 WHEREAS, Thomas Creek was born April 7, 1950, in Joplin,
 Missouri; he grew up in Amarillo and graduated from Palo Duro
 High School, where he was a member of the band; and
 WHEREAS, He enlisted in the United States Marine Corps on
 January 16, 1968, and completed his basic training at Camp
 Pendleton; he was transferred to Vietnam and was serving as a fire
 team leader with the 3rd Battalion, 9th Marines, 3rd Marine Division
 when he valiantly gave his life in service to his country; and
 WHEREAS, Lance Corporal Creek's unit came under heavy enemy
 fire near the resettlement village of Cam Lo; while moving to a
 position from which he could better return fire, he was seriously
 wounded and fell into a gully alongside several of his fellow
 Marines; when an enemy grenade fell in their midst, Lance Corporal
 Creek, without a thought for his own safety, rolled onto the grenade
 and absorbed the blast, courageously saving the lives of five
 Marines; and
 WHEREAS, He was awarded the nation's highest accolade, the
 Medal of Honor, for his heroism, and he is Amarillo's only
 recipient and the youngest Texan to ever be awarded the medal;
 his other medals include the Purple Heart, the National Defense
 Service Medal, and the Vietnam Service Medal with two bronze
 stars; it is truly fitting that he be posthumously honored by the
 Texas Senate; now, therefore, be it
 RESOLVED, That the Senate of the State of Texas, 86th
 Legislature, hereby pay tribute to the life and indomitable
 spirit of Thomas E. Creek; and, be it further
 RESOLVED, That a copy of this Resolution be prepared in
 honor of his heroic service.
 Seliger
  ________________________________
  President of the Senate
  I hereby certify that the
  above Resolution was adopted by
  the Senate on February 7, 2019, by
  a rising vote.
  ________________________________
  Secretary of the Senate
  ________________________________
  Member, Texas Senate