Texas 2019 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR229 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 02/25/2019

                    SENATE RESOLUTION NO. 229
 In Memory
 of
 Ryan Keith Wallace
 WHEREAS, The Senate of the State of Texas honors and
 commemorates the life of Ryan Keith Wallace, who died
 December 5, 2018, at the age of 27; and
 WHEREAS, Ryan Wallace was born on October 24, 1991, in
 Lubbock, to Ronnie and Connie Wallace; he grew up in Seminole
 with his brother, Kevin, and graduated from Seminole High School;
 he and his beloved wife, Kyrie Cameron Wallace, were married on
 August 18, 2018; and
 WHEREAS, Ryan earned a degree from The University of Texas
 at Austin, where he was a member of Sigma Chi Fraternity and the
 Silver Spurs; passionate about politics, he was active in student
 government and served as director of the State Relations agency;
 he also worked in the office of State Senator Charles Perry
 during his time in Austin; and
 WHEREAS, Mr. Wallace was a summa cum laude graduate of the
 South Texas College of Law, where he received various accolades
 for his work; he was inducted into the National Order of Scribes
 and the Order of Barristers, and he earned numerous honors for
 Best Brief at college and bar association competitions across the
 country; and
 WHEREAS, Upon his graduation, he accepted a position as an
 associate with the firm of Hunton Andrews Kurth in the Capital
 Markets Section, and he practiced law in the areas of capital
 markets and securities, corporate mergers and acquisitions, and
 corporate governance and compliance; and
 WHEREAS, He was a young man of courage, strength, and
 generosity who gave unselfishly to others, and his valued counsel
 and his enthusiasm for living each day to the fullest will not be
 forgotten; and
 WHEREAS, He was a devoted husband, son, brother, and
 grandson, and he leaves behind memories that will be treasured
 forever by his family and many friends; now, therefore, be it
 RESOLVED, That the Senate of the State of Texas, 86th
 Legislature, hereby extend sincere condolences to the bereaved
 family of Ryan Keith Wallace; and, be it further
 RESOLVED, That a copy of this Resolution be prepared for
 his family as an expression of deepest sympathy from the Texas
 Senate and that when the Senate adjourns this day, it do so in
 memory of Ryan Wallace.
 Perry
 Alvarado Hinojosa Paxton Alvarado Hinojosa Paxton
Alvarado Hinojosa Paxton
 Bettencourt Huffman Powell Bettencourt Huffman Powell
Bettencourt Huffman Powell
 Birdwell Hughes Rodríguez Birdwell Hughes Rodríguez
Birdwell Hughes Rodríguez
 Buckingham Johnson Schwertner Buckingham Johnson Schwertner
Buckingham Johnson Schwertner
 Campbell Kolkhorst Seliger Campbell Kolkhorst Seliger
Campbell Kolkhorst Seliger
 Creighton Lucio Taylor Creighton Lucio Taylor
Creighton Lucio Taylor
 Fallon Menéndez Watson Fallon Menéndez Watson
Fallon Menéndez Watson
 Flores Miles West Flores Miles West
Flores Miles West
 Hall Nelson Whitmire Hall Nelson Whitmire
Hall Nelson Whitmire
 Hancock Nichols Zaffirini Hancock Nichols Zaffirini
Hancock Nichols Zaffirini
 Patrick, President of the Senate
  ________________________________
  President of the Senate
  I hereby certify that the
  above Resolution was adopted by
  the Senate on February 25, 2019,
  by a rising vote.
  ________________________________
  Secretary of the Senate
  ________________________________
  Member, Texas Senate

Alvarado Hinojosa Paxton

Bettencourt Huffman Powell

Birdwell Hughes Rodríguez

Buckingham Johnson Schwertner

Campbell Kolkhorst Seliger

Creighton Lucio Taylor

Fallon Menéndez Watson

Flores Miles West

Hall Nelson Whitmire

Hancock Nichols Zaffirini