Texas 2019 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR243 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 02/25/2019

                    SENATE RESOLUTION NO. 243
 In Memory
 of
 John J. McKetta Jr.
 WHEREAS, The Senate of the State of Texas honors and
 commemorates the life of John J. McKetta Jr., who died
 January 15, 2019, at the age of 103; and
 WHEREAS, Johnny McKetta was born on October 17, 1915, in
 Wyano, Pennsylvania, to John and Mary McKetta, and he grew up in
 the coal towns of western Pennsylvania; he mined coal for a time
 and was a regional Golden Gloves boxing champion before studying
 chemical engineering at Trine University in Indiana; and
 WHEREAS, He and his beloved wife, the late Helen Elisabeth
 Smith "Pinky" McKetta, married on October 17, 1943, and they enjoyed
 67 years of marriage together; they were blessed with four children,
 and their many grandchildren and great-grandchildren were a source
 of much pride and joy for him; and
 WHEREAS, Johnny McKetta joined the faculty of The
 University of Texas at Austin in 1946 as a chemical engineering
 professor; he went on to become one of the most widely respected
 professors in his field, and he was beloved by many generations
 of students for his engaging sense of humor and his ability to
 inspire them in their studies; he served as dean of the
 university's College of Engineering, and he was a prolific
 author; in 2012, the university renamed his home department the
 John J. McKetta Jr. Department of Chemical Engineering; and
 WHEREAS, One of the world's foremost experts on energy, he
 served as an advisor to five United States presidents and held
 leadership positions with the National Energy Policy Committee
 and the Southern Interstate Nuclear Board; he was the editor of a
 68-volume encyclopedia and the author or editor of 20 other
 books, and he published approximately 400 articles in scholarly
 journals; and
 WHEREAS, He was elected by his peers to serve as president
 of the American Institute of Chemical Engineers, and in 1989, he
 was awarded the Hoover Medal, which recognizes great, unselfish,
 nontechnical services by engineers to humanity; he served for 50
 years as a trustee at his alma mater, Trine University, which
 also named its chemical engineering department in his honor; and
 WHEREAS, He was a devoted husband, father, and
 grandfather, and he leaves behind memories that will be treasured
 forever by all who were privileged to share in his life; now,
 therefore, be it
 RESOLVED, That the Senate of the State of Texas, 86th
 Legislature, hereby extend sincere condolences to the bereaved
 family of John J. McKetta Jr.; and, be it further
 RESOLVED, That a copy of this Resolution be prepared for
 his family as an expression of deepest sympathy from the Texas
 Senate and that when the Senate adjourns this day, it do so in
 memory of John J. McKetta Jr.
 Watson
  ________________________________
  President of the Senate
  I hereby certify that the
  above Resolution was adopted by
  the Senate on February 25, 2019,
  by a rising vote.
  ________________________________
  Secretary of the Senate
  ________________________________
  Member, Texas Senate