Texas 2019 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR282 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 02/27/2019

                    SENATE RESOLUTION NO. 282
 In Memory
 of
 James W. Arnold
 WHEREAS, A full and productive life drew to a close with
 the passing of James W. Arnold of Tyler on January 19, 2019, at
 the age of 87; and
 WHEREAS, Born in Arp on February 8, 1931, Jim Arnold was
 the son of Loys and Clara Arnold; he grew up with two brothers,
 Richard and Paul, and he graduated as valedictorian of London
 High School; while completing his bachelor's degree in
 mechanical engineering at Southern Methodist University, he
 worked during summers as a roughneck; and
 WHEREAS, Mr. Arnold married his high school sweetheart,
 the former Bessie Nell Hazzard, on July 19, 1952, and they
 settled in Tyler, where they raised their four children, Sherry,
 Keith, Jamie, and Mollie; in later years, he welcomed into his
 treasured family nine grandsons, Ben, Walter, James, Stephen,
 Jonathan, John, Jimmy, Will, and A. D., and four granddaughters,
 Melissa, Nellie, Bessie, and Lilly, as well as eight
 great-grandchildren; and
 WHEREAS, Mr. Arnold's career began with Woolf & Magee,
 where he was hired as a drilling engineer and rose to become
 president and owner of the company; a leader in his industry, he
 served as president of the board of the International Association
 of Drilling Contractors; he also enjoyed investing in oil and gas
 ventures, and he was a member of the boards of the American
 Petroleum Institute and the National Petroleum Council; highly
 respected in the Tyler business community, he was a founding
 director of Heritage National Bank and president of the Tyler
 Area Chamber of Commerce board; he further served as chair of the
 East Texas Medical Center Regional Healthcare System, chair of
 the Stewart Regional Blood Center, and president of the Texas
 Rose Festival Association; for more than two decades, he
 officiated high school football games, and he served as president
 of the Tyler Chapter of the Southwest Football Officials
 Association; he was also a valued member of Green Acres Baptist
 Church for nearly 45 years and served as deacon emeritus, and his
 strong faith shone through his generosity and compassion; and
 WHEREAS, Deeply devoted to his family and his community,
 Jim Arnold made a meaningful difference in the lives of his loved
 ones and fellow citizens alike, and his contributions will be
 fondly remembered for years to come; now, therefore, be it
 RESOLVED, That the Senate of the State of Texas, 86th
 Legislature, hereby pay tribute to the memory of James W. Arnold
 and extend sincere condolences to all who mourn his passing; and,
 be it further
 RESOLVED, That an official copy of this Resolution be
 prepared for his family and that when the Texas Senate adjourns
 this day, it do so in memory of James W. "Jim" Arnold.
 Hughes
  ________________________________
  President of the Senate
  I hereby certify that the
  above Resolution was adopted by
  the Senate on February 27, 2019,
  by a rising vote.
  ________________________________
  Secretary of the Senate
  ________________________________
  Member, Texas Senate