Texas 2019 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR341 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 03/07/2019

                    SENATE RESOLUTION NO. 341
 In Memory
 of
 Charles Winfred Snyder Sr.
 WHEREAS, A rich and purposeful life drew to a close with
 the passing of Charles Winfred Snyder Sr. on January 21, 2019, at
 the age of 96; and
 WHEREAS, The son of John and Estelle Haddox Snyder, Charles
 Snyder was born near Okemah, Oklahoma, on April 19, 1922; he grew
 up with four brothers and a sister in western Oklahoma before
 moving with his family to the Texas Panhandle when he was 15 years
 old; following the attack on Pearl Harbor, he answered his
 nation's call to duty by enlisting in the United States Army; his
 service during World War II included tours in North Africa and
 Italy, and he earned a European-African-Middle Eastern Campaign
 Medal with five Bronze Stars for his valorous efforts; he was
 honorably discharged from the military in 1945, at the rank of
 sergeant; and
 WHEREAS, Mr. Snyder was joined in matrimony to the former
 Dorothy Johnson on January 31, 1948, and they shared a rewarding
 union that spanned more than 67 years; in the course of their
 marriage, the couple became the proud parents of four children,
 Clifford, Linda, Elsie, and Chuck, and later in life, Mr. Snyder
 had the pleasure of seeing his cherished family grow to include
 four grandchildren, Rachel, Cecilia, Donnie, and Annelise, and
 four great-grandchildren, Thomas, Devin, Lila, and Novi; and
 WHEREAS, Displaying a strong work ethic from an early age,
 Mr. Snyder earned money as a child by tending to cotton fields,
 and he went on to hold several jobs before striking out on his own
 as a paint contractor; in 1952, he and his wife settled in
 Marshall, where he earned a bachelor's degree in religious
 studies from East Texas Baptist University; after completing his
 education, he established another business, Classic Homes by
 Charles Snyder, going on to construct more than a hundred classic
 homes in the Marshall area; a man of strong faith, he was also an
 ordained Baptist minister, and he preached at the First Baptist
 Church mission in Jefferson and served as a substitute pastor for
 other local congregations; he was a valued member of Central
 Baptist Church for six decades; and
 WHEREAS, Charles Snyder embraced life with joy and
 enthusiasm, and although he is deeply missed, he will forever
 remain a vibrant presence for those who knew and loved him; now,
 therefore, be it
 RESOLVED, That the Senate of the State of Texas, 86th
 Legislature, hereby pay tribute to the memory of Charles Winfred
 Snyder Sr. and extend sincere sympathy to all who mourn his
 passing; and, be it further
 RESOLVED, That an official copy of this Resolution be
 prepared for his family and that when the Texas Senate adjourns
 this day, it do so in memory of Charles Snyder.
 Hughes
  ________________________________
  President of the Senate
  I hereby certify that the
  above Resolution was adopted by
  the Senate on March 7, 2019, by a
  rising vote.
  ________________________________
  Secretary of the Senate
  ________________________________
  Member, Texas Senate