Texas 2019 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR465 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 03/21/2019

                    SENATE RESOLUTION NO. 465
 In Memory
 of
 Jerry Don Lambright
 WHEREAS, The Senate of the State of Texas honors and
 commemorates the life of Jerry Don Lambright, who died
 March 9, 2019, at the age of 69; and
 WHEREAS, J. D. Lambright was born to Bill and Frances
 Lambright on October 25, 1949, and he grew up in the West Texas
 town of Pampa; and
 WHEREAS, He earned both bachelor and master of science
 degrees in electrical engineering from Texas Tech University,
 and he went on to earn a law degree from South Texas College of
 Law; and
 WHEREAS, J. D. devoted the first 25 years of his career to
 working as a geophysicist and electrical engineer for Shell Oil
 Company and Shell Exploration and Production Technology
 Company in Houston; after retiring from Shell, he opened his
 own law firm in Conroe, and over the course of 13 years in
 private practice, he handled a variety of civil, family,
 criminal, and probate cases; and
 WHEREAS, Mr. Lambright contributed to the Montgomery
 County community in myriad ways, and he served three terms on the
 Montgomery County Bar Association Board of Directors; he was an
 esteemed civic leader who was widely respected for his forthright
 manner, his conscientious devotion to duty, and his commitment to
 ethical principles; and
 WHEREAS, With a desire to serve in a broader capacity, he
 sought the office of county attorney, and he was elected by the
 voters of Montgomery County in 2012; he worked hard to make the
 office more responsive and more effective, and he was sworn in
 for his second term in office on January 1, 2017; and
 WHEREAS, During his tenure of leadership, the Montgomery
 County Attorney's Office was recognized three times as the
 county's Department of the Year, and in 2014 and 2015,
 Mr. Lambright was honored as the county's Boss of the Year; and
 WHEREAS, J. D. shared more than four decades of marriage
 with his high school sweetheart, Belinda Lambright, and they made
 many lasting memories riding motorcycles and attending
 professional bull riding events together; and
 WHEREAS, J. D. Lambright was a revered citizen and a
 treasured friend to many, and he leaves behind a legacy of
 integrity and selfless service; now, therefore, be it
 RESOLVED, That the Senate of the State of Texas, 86th
 Legislature, hereby extend sincere condolences to the bereaved
 family of Jerry Don Lambright; and, be it further
 RESOLVED, That a copy of this Resolution be prepared for
 his family as an expression of deepest sympathy from the Texas
 Senate and that when the Senate adjourns this day, it do so in
 memory of J. D. Lambright.
 Creighton
  ________________________________
  President of the Senate
  I hereby certify that the
  above Resolution was adopted by
  the Senate on March 21, 2019, by a
  rising vote.
  ________________________________
  Secretary of the Senate
  ________________________________
  Member, Texas Senate