Texas 2019 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR494 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 03/26/2019

                    SENATE RESOLUTION NO. 494
 In Memory
 of
 Austin McCloud
 WHEREAS, The Senate of the State of Texas honors and
 commemorates the life of Judge Austin McCloud, a revered judicial
 leader who died November 30, 2018, at the age of 89; and
 WHEREAS, Born March 17, 1929, in Edom, Texas, Austin
 McCloud was a beloved citizen and a distinguished legal scholar
 who left an indelible mark on the courts of Texas during a long
 and celebrated career on the bench; and
 WHEREAS, Austin McCloud earned a bachelor of business
 administration degree from Texas Tech University in 1951; he went
 on to serve with distinction as a member of the United States Air
 Force during the Korean War, and he returned to his home state to
 earn his juris doctorate degree from Baylor University; and
 WHEREAS, He worked for several years as an attorney in
 Houston and Colorado City, and he ascended to the bench in 1963,
 when he was appointed district judge of the 32nd District Court
 of Texas; he was elected chief justice of the 11th District Court
 of Civil Appeals in November of 1970, and he retired on
 December 31, 1994, after 24 years of meritorious service; and
 WHEREAS, Described as a giant in the Texas Judiciary, Chief
 Justice McCloud was a leader among his colleagues, and his
 skillfully drafted opinions were considered to be among the likes
 of those written by a number of famous judicial heavyweights; he
 shared his keen knowledge of the law through continuous and
 thoughtful mentorship, and his expertise was invaluable to the
 many professional associations in which he served; and
 WHEREAS, Judge McCloud shared a full and rewarding life
 with his beloved wife, Mary Anne McCloud; they contributed
 greatly to their community, and they gave generously of their
 time to the M.D. Anderson Cancer Center and to Polo on the
 Prairie; they were blessed with two daughters, six
 grandchildren, and nine great-grandchildren; and
 WHEREAS, Austin McCloud was a spirited and captivating
 storyteller who was widely known for his sharp wit, his
 infectious smile, and his warmth and kindness; he was a treasured
 citizen of the Lone Star State, and his contributions to the
 Texas Judiciary will continue to have a positive impact for years
 to come; now, therefore, be it
 RESOLVED, That the Senate of the State of Texas, 86th
 Legislature, hereby extend sincere condolences to the bereaved
 family of Judge Austin McCloud; and, be it further
 RESOLVED, That a copy of this Resolution be prepared for
 his family as an expression of deepest sympathy from the Texas
 Senate and that when the Senate adjourns this day, it do so in
 memory of Austin McCloud.
 Perry
  ________________________________
  President of the Senate
  I hereby certify that the
  above Resolution was adopted by
  the Senate on March 26, 2019, by a
  rising vote.
  ________________________________
  Secretary of the Senate
  ________________________________
  Member, Texas Senate