Texas 2019 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR783 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 05/22/2019

                    SENATE RESOLUTION NO. 783
 In Memory
 of
 Waun Ki Hong
 WHEREAS, Trailblazing scientist Dr. Waun Ki Hong died on
 January 2, 2019, at the age of 76, bringing a great loss to
 oncological medicine and to his colleagues at The University of
 Texas MD Anderson Cancer Center; and
 WHEREAS, The son of Sung Koo Hong and Bok Young Shin, Ki
 Hong was born in Korea on August 13, 1942; he graduated from
 Yonsei University College of Medicine and served as a flight
 surgeon in the South Korean Air Force during the Vietnam War; on
 September 6, 1969, he married the love of his life, Mi Hwa, and
 the following year, they immigrated to the United States; the
 couple were blessed with two sons, Ed and Burt, and they later
 welcomed into their family four grandchildren, Elizabeth,
 Daniel, William, and Vivienne; and
 WHEREAS, Dr. Hong completed his internship at
 Bronx-Lebanon Hospital in New York City, his residency at the
 Veterans Affairs Medical Center in Boston, and a fellowship at
 Memorial Sloan Kettering Cancer Center in New York; returning to
 the VA Medical Center as chief of medical oncology, he helped
 establish its training program and led a series of landmark
 laryngeal cancer trials that transformed treatment of the
 disease and laid a foundation for organ preservation in numerous
 cancer types; he joined MD Anderson in 1984 as section chief in
 head and neck medical oncology; earning recognition as "the
 father of chemoprevention," he conducted research leading to
 targeted therapies, allowing the identification and treatment of
 people at high risk of cancer and the fine-tuning of therapies
 for individuals; he led the Division of Cancer Medicine from 2001
 until his retirement in 2014 and then continued to serve as a
 special advisor; and
 WHEREAS, Over the years, Dr. Hong authored nearly 700
 articles, edited 11 major books, and served on the editorial
 boards of 17 scientific journals; he received over $70 million in
 research funding, and he was recognized with numerous honors,
 including the American Cancer Society Medal of Honor, as well as
 awards from the American Association for Cancer Research, which
 he served as president, and the American Society of Clinical
 Oncology; he took greatest pride in having trained hundreds of
 oncologists, and in 2016, the AACR established the Waun Ki Hong
 Award for Outstanding Achievement in Translational and Clinical
 Cancer Research to encourage young scientists; and
 WHEREAS, Ki Hong's groundbreaking research has extended
 and improved the lives of countless cancer patients, and he has
 left a further legacy through the many scientists and physicians
 he mentored over the course of his accomplished career; now,
 therefore, be it
 RESOLVED, That the Senate of the State of Texas, 86th
 Legislature, hereby pay tribute to the life of Dr. Waun Ki Hong
 and extend sincere condolences to all who mourn his passing; and,
 be it further
 RESOLVED, That an official copy of this Resolution be
 prepared for his family and that when the Texas Senate adjourns
 this day, it do so in memory of Dr. Waun Ki Hong.
 Miles
  ________________________________
  President of the Senate
  I hereby certify that the
  above Resolution was adopted by
  the Senate on May 21, 2019, by a
  rising vote.
  ________________________________
  Secretary of the Senate
  ________________________________
  Member, Texas Senate