Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR793 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 05/21/2019

                            SENATE RESOLUTION NO. 793
 In Memory
 of
 Jose M. Lopez
 WHEREAS, The Senate of the State of Texas honors and
 commemorates the life and service of Sergeant Jose M. Lopez, who
 died May 16, 2005, at the age of 92; and
 WHEREAS, Jose Lopez was born June 1, 1912; he grew up in
 Brownsville with his uncle after losing his parents at a young
 age; he learned the value of hard work by taking jobs to help
 support his new family; he married Emilia Herrera, and they
 enjoyed 62 years of marriage together; and
 WHEREAS, Soon after the outbreak of World War II, Mr. Lopez
 enlisted in the United States Army; on December 17, 1944, while
 under heavy enemy fire during the Battle of the Bulge, he
 disregarded his own safety and moved his heavy machine gun
 multiple times to prevent German troops from overwhelming his
 unit's position; and
 WHEREAS, In the face of advancing tanks and numerically
 superior forces, he continued to move his machine gun where it
 would best support his unit; he is credited with killing more than
 100 enemy soldiers and with almost singlehandedly keeping his unit
 from being overrun; in recognition of his courage and intrepidity,
 he was awarded the Medal of Honor, the highest decoration given to
 a member of the United States armed forces; and
 WHEREAS, After the war, he returned to Brownsville, and his
 service has been commemorated with a statue in his likeness in
 Brownsville'sVeteransPark;inaddition,thecitizensof
 Mission honored his extraordinary acts of heroism by naming a
 park and a street in his honor; and
 WHEREAS, A shining example of a true American hero,
 Sergeant Lopez is a part of the long line of brave men and women
 whose courage and sacrifice have left an indelible mark on this
 state and nation; he has left behind memories that will be
 treasured forever by all who were privileged to share in his
 life; now, therefore, be it
 RESOLVED, That the Senate of the State of Texas, 86th
 Legislature, hereby pay tribute to the life and legacy of
 Sergeant Jose M. Lopez; and, be it further
 RESOLVED, That a copy of this Resolution be prepared for
 his family as an expression of gratitude and respect and that
 when the Senate adjourns this day, it do so in memory of Sergeant
 Jose M. Lopez.
 Lucio
  ________________________________
  President of the Senate
  I hereby certify that the
  above Resolution was adopted by
  the Senate on May 21, 2019, by a
  rising vote.
  ________________________________
  Secretary of the Senate
  ________________________________
  Member, Texas Senate