Texas 2019 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR96 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 01/30/2019

                    SENATE RESOLUTION NO. 96
 In Memory
 of
 Robert Vance Elkins
 and
 Von Dean Rose Elkins
 WHEREAS, Residents of Tuscola suffered a heartbreaking
 loss on December 13, 2018, with the passing of Mayor Robert Vance
 Elkins, 82, and his wife, Von Dean Rose Elkins, 80, two respected
 and much-loved members of the community; and
 WHEREAS, A native of Brownwood, Robert Elkins was born on
 September 3, 1936, to Robert and Roxie Elkins; after graduating
 from Brownwood High School and serving in the United States Naval
 Reserve, he joined the United States Army and was assigned to the
 Honor Guard in Washington, D.C., where he had the distinction of
 being present at the inauguration of President John F. Kennedy; and
 WHEREAS, Following his discharge, Mr. Elkins worked for 36
 years for the Texas Department of Transportation, which
 eventually promoted him to regional chief inspector; he served as
 a consultant for a number of paving companies after retiring from
 the department in 1994; his desire to make a positive difference
 in the lives of his fellow citizens led him to serve as a member
 of the city council from 2013 to 2016 and as mayor of Tuscola
 since 2016; during his time in office, he earned the high regard
 of his colleagues and constituents through his strong leadership,
 his genial manner, and his endearing sense of humor; and
 WHEREAS, The former Von Dean Rose was born on December 29,
 1937, in Runnels County to Bonnie and Lottie Mae Rose; she
 attended Morton High School, Lawn High School, and Draughon's
 Business School in Abilene, before working for Master's
 Manufacturing and Thornton's Department Store; she spent more
 than three decades at First State Bank of Tuscola, where she was a
 valued and beloved employee; and
 WHEREAS, This esteemed couple were united in matrimony in
 Tuscola on February 8, 1964, and they lived there for the
 entirety of their 54 years of marriage; they raised two children,
 Rhonda and Tony, and later welcomed into their family six
 grandchildren, Demi, Dalton, Dillion, Ian, Colter, and Garrett,
 and two great-grandchildren, Aden and Tate; Mr. and Mrs. Elkins
 were further cherished by numerous friends and neighbors, who
 admired them for the kindness and generosity with which they
 treated everyone they encountered; and
 WHEREAS, Deeply dedicated to their family and their
 community, Robert and Von Dean Elkins were a blessing in the
 lives of many, and they will forever hold a treasured place in the
 hearts of those they have left behind; now, therefore, be it
 RESOLVED, That the Senate of the State of Texas, 86th
 Legislature, hereby pay tribute to the memory of Mayor Robert
 Vance Elkins and Von Dean Rose Elkins of Tuscola and extend
 sincere condolences to all who mourn their passing; and, be
 it further
 RESOLVED, That an official copy of this Resolution be
 prepared for their family and that when the Texas Senate adjourns
 this day, it do so in memory of Robert and Von Dean Elkins.
 Buckingham
  ________________________________
  President of the Senate
  I hereby certify that the
  above Resolution was adopted by
  the Senate on January 30, 2019, by
  a rising vote.
  ________________________________
  Secretary of the Senate
  ________________________________
  Member, Texas Senate