Senate
|
05/25/2021
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2021
|
Co-sponsor authorized
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2021
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2021
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2021
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2021
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2021
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2021
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2021
|
Referred to Jurisprudence
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2021
|
Read first time
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2021
|
Received from the House
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2021
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2021
|
Record vote RV#59
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2021
|
Passed
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2021
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2021
|
Record vote RV#51
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2021
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2021
|
Point of order sustained (amendment) Rule 11, Section 2
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2021
|
Amendment(s) offered 3-Martinez Fischer
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2021
|
Amendment withdrawn 2-Vasut
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2021
|
Amendment withdrawn 1-P. King
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2021
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2021
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2021
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2021
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2021
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2021
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2021
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2021
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2021
|
Referred to State Affairs
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2021
|
Filed
|
|
|