Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1071 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 05/18/2021

                            H.B. No. 1071


 AN ACT
 relating to the presence of a qualified facility dog or qualified
 therapy dog in certain court proceedings.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Chapter 21, Government Code, is amended by
 adding Section 21.012 to read as follows:
 Sec. 21.012.  PRESENCE OF QUALIFIED FACILITY DOG OR
 QUALIFIED THERAPY DOG IN COURT PROCEEDING. (a) In this section:
 (1)  "Qualified facility dog" means a dog that:
 (A)  is a graduate of a program operated by an
 assistance dog organization that is a member of a nationally
 recognized assistance dog association; or
 (B)  before January 1, 2021, on the approval of
 the court, served in a court proceeding by accompanying a witness
 who was testifying.
 (2)  "Qualified therapy dog" means a dog that
 successfully completes a program operated by an organization that
 registers, insures, or certifies a therapy dog and the dog's
 handler as meeting or exceeding the standards of practice in
 animal-assisted interventions.
 (b)  Any party to an action filed in a court in this state in
 which a proceeding related to the action will be held may petition
 the court for an order authorizing a qualified facility dog or
 qualified therapy dog to be present with a witness who is testifying
 before the court through:
 (1)  in-person testimony; or
 (2)  closed-circuit video teleconferencing testimony.
 (c)  The court may enter an order authorizing a qualified
 facility dog or qualified therapy dog to accompany a witness
 testifying at the court proceeding if:
 (1)  the presence of the dog will assist the witness in
 providing testimony; and
 (2)  the party petitioning for the order provides proof
 of liability insurance coverage in effect for the dog.
 (d)  A handler who is trained to manage the qualified
 facility dog or qualified therapy dog must accompany the dog
 provided for a witness at a court proceeding.
 (e)  A party to the action must petition the court for an
 order under Subsection (b) not later than the 14th day before the
 date of the court proceeding.
 (f)  A court may:
 (1)  impose restrictions on the presence of the
 qualified facility dog or qualified therapy dog during the court
 proceeding; and
 (2)  issue instructions to the jury, as applicable,
 regarding the presence of the dog.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 1071 was passed by the House on April
 9, 2021, by the following vote:  Yeas 144, Nays 0, 2 present, not
 voting; and that the House concurred in Senate amendments to H.B.
 No. 1071 on May 18, 2021, by the following vote:  Yeas 137, Nays 4,
 1 present, not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 1071 was passed by the Senate, with
 amendments, on May 12, 2021, by the following vote:  Yeas 30, Nays
 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 APPROVED: __________________
 Date
 __________________
 Governor