Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1075 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 13, 2021

Analysis

Analysis May 13, 2021
Analysis April 26, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 12, 2021
Fiscal Note April 10, 2021