Texas 2021 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1081 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/22/2021

                    By: Kuempel, Guillen (Senate Sponsor - Zaffirini) H.B. No. 1081
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 12, 2021;
 April 13, 2021, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Transportation; April 22, 2021, reported favorably by the
 following vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0; April 22, 2021, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the issuance of specialty license plates to honor
 recipients of the Presidential Service Badge.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 504.202(e-1), Transportation Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (e-1)  Other than license plates issued under Subsection
 (h), license plates issued under this section may include, on
 request:
 (1)  the emblem of the veteran's branch of service; or
 (2)  one emblem from another license plate to which the
 person is entitled under Section 504.308, 504.309, 504.310(b),
 504.311, 504.312, 504.313, 504.3135, 504.314, 504.315, 504.316,
 504.3161, 504.318, 504.319, 504.320, 504.323, [as added by Chapter
 1085 (H.B. 3567), Acts of the 85th Legislature, Regular Session,
 2017, or] 504.325, or 504.327.
 SECTION 2.  Subchapter D, Chapter 504, Transportation Code,
 is amended by adding Section 504.327 to read as follows:
 Sec. 504.327.  PRESIDENTIAL SERVICE BADGE. The department
 shall issue specialty license plates for persons awarded the
 Presidential Service Badge. The license plates must include:
 (1)  the words "Presidential Service Badge"; and
 (2)  a depiction of the Presidential Service Badge.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 * * * * *