Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1081 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 13, 2021

Enrolled

Bill April 30, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill April 22, 2021
Bill March 23, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note April 17, 2021
Fiscal Note March 14, 2021

Analysis

Analysis April 16, 2021
Analysis March 23, 2021