Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1090 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 13, 2021

Engrossed

Bill May 6, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 27, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 22, 2021
Bill April 30, 2021

Analysis

Analysis May 21, 2021
Analysis April 29, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 20, 2021
Fiscal Note April 29, 2021
Fiscal Note April 18, 2021