Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1092 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 13, 2021

Engrossed

Bill April 30, 2021

Analysis

Analysis May 13, 2021
Analysis March 31, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill March 31, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note March 14, 2021