Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1097 Latest Draft

Bill / Comm Sub Version Filed 05/20/2021

                            By: Lozano (Senate Sponsor - Zaffirini) H.B. No. 1097
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 3, 2021;
 May 14, 2021, read first time and referred to Committee on Health &
 Human Services; May 20, 2021, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 8, Nays 0; May 20, 2021, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the processing and sale of kratom and kratom products;
 providing civil penalties; creating a criminal offense.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  This Act shall be known as the Texas Kratom
 Consumer Health and Safety Protection Act.
 SECTION 2.  Subtitle A, Title 6, Health and Safety Code, is
 amended by adding Chapter 444 to read as follows:
 CHAPTER 444. MANUFACTURE, DISTRIBUTION, AND SALE OF
 KRATOM PRODUCTS
 Sec. 444.001.  DEFINITIONS. In this chapter:
 (1)  "Food" has the meaning assigned by Section
 431.002.
 (2)  "Kratom" means any part of the leaf of the plant
 Mitragyna speciosa.
 (3)  "Kratom processor" means a person who:
 (A)  manufactures, prepares, distributes, or
 maintains kratom products for sale;
 (B)  advertises, represents, or holds oneself out
 as a seller, preparer, or manufacturer of kratom products;
 (C)  is responsible for ensuring the purity and
 proper labeling of kratom products; or
 (D)  packages or labels kratom products.
 (4)  "Kratom product" means a food, including an
 extract, capsule, or pill, containing any form of kratom.
 (5)  "Kratom retailer" means a kratom processor who
 engages in selling kratom products to consumers or who advertises,
 represents, or holds oneself out as a person who sells kratom
 products to consumers.
 Sec. 444.002.  LABELING REQUIRED. (a)  A kratom processor
 shall label each kratom product with the product use directions
 necessary to ensure safe and effective use of the product by a
 consumer, including the recommended serving size for the product.
 (b)  A kratom retailer may not sell a kratom product that is
 not properly labeled under this section.
 Sec. 444.003.  ADULTERATED, CONTAMINATED, AND PROHIBITED
 PRODUCTS.  A kratom processor or kratom retailer may not prepare,
 distribute, sell, or offer to sell a kratom product that:
 (1)  is adulterated with a dangerous non-kratom
 substance affecting the quality or strength of the product to a
 degree that renders the product injurious to a consumer;
 (2)  is contaminated with a poisonous or otherwise
 deleterious non-kratom substance, including any substance
 designated as a controlled substance by Chapter 481 (Texas
 Controlled Substances Act);
 (3)  has a level of 7-hydroxymitragynine in the
 alkaloid fraction that is greater than two percent of the overall
 alkaloid composition of the product; or
 (4)  contains any synthetic alkaloids, including
 synthetic 7-hydroxymitragynine and synthetically derived compounds
 from a kratom plant.
 Sec. 444.004.  OFFENSE FOR DISTRIBUTION OR SALE OF KRATOM
 PRODUCT TO MINOR. (a)  A person commits an offense if the person
 distributes, sells, or exposes for sale a kratom product to someone
 who is younger than 18 years of age.
 (b)  An offense under this section is a Class C misdemeanor.
 Sec. 444.005.  CIVIL PENALTY. (a)  A person who violates
 this chapter is subject to a civil penalty in the amount of:
 (1)  $250 for the first violation;
 (2)  $500 for the second violation; and
 (3)  $1,000 for each subsequent violation.
 (b)  Each day a violation continues or occurs is a separate
 violation for purposes of imposing a penalty under this section.
 (c)  A kratom retailer is not liable for a civil penalty
 under this section for a violation of Section 444.002 or 444.003 if
 the kratom retailer proves by a preponderance of the evidence that
 the violation was unintentional and due to the kratom retailer's
 good faith reliance on the representation of another kratom
 processor.
 (d)  The attorney general, the district or county attorney
 for the county, or the municipal attorney of the municipality in
 which the violation is alleged to have occurred may bring an action
 to recover a civil penalty under this section.
 Sec. 444.006.  PENALTIES UNDER OTHER LAW.  The penalties
 prescribed by this chapter are in addition to any other penalties
 prescribed by law, including penalties prescribed by Chapters 431
 and 481.
 Sec. 444.007.  RULES. The executive commissioner may adopt
 rules consistent with this chapter as necessary to ensure the safe
 consumption and distribution of kratom and kratom products.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 * * * * *