Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1110 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 14, 2021

Engrossed

Bill April 30, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill April 14, 2021

Analysis

Analysis April 14, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note April 5, 2021
Fiscal Note March 22, 2021