Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1118 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 14, 2021

Engrossed

Bill April 8, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 5, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note April 29, 2021
Fiscal Note April 20, 2021
Fiscal Note April 16, 2021
Fiscal Note March 22, 2021
Fiscal Note March 10, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill April 21, 2021
Bill March 29, 2021

Analysis

Analysis April 20, 2021
Analysis April 14, 2021
Analysis March 29, 2021