Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1124 Compare Versions

Only one version of the bill is available at this time.
OldNewDifferences
11 By: Muñoz, Jr. H.B. No. 1124
22
33
44 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
55 AN ACT
66 relating to a cost-of-living adjustment applicable to certain
77 benefits paid by the Teacher Retirement System of Texas, including
88 a related study.
99 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
1010 SECTION 1. Subchapter H, Chapter 824, Government Code, is
1111 amended by adding Section 824.703 to read as follows:
1212 Sec. 824.703. ADDITIONAL COST-OF-LIVING ADJUSTMENT. (a)
1313 Notwithstanding Section 824.702 and subject to Section 821.006, the
1414 retirement system shall make a one-time cost-of-living adjustment
1515 payable to annuitants receiving a monthly death or retirement
1616 benefit annuity, as provided by this section.
1717 (b) Subject to Subsections (c) and (d), to be eligible for
1818 the adjustment, a person must be, on the effective date of the
1919 adjustment and disregarding any forfeiture of benefits under
2020 Section 824.601, an annuitant eligible to receive:
2121 (1) a standard service or disability retirement
2222 annuity payment;
2323 (2) an optional service or disability retirement
2424 annuity payment as either a retiree or beneficiary;
2525 (3) an annuity payment under Section 824.402(a)(3) or
2626 (4);
2727 (4) an annuity payment under Section 824.502; or
2828 (5) an alternate payee annuity payment under Section
2929 804.005.
3030 (c) If the annuitant:
3131 (1) is a retiree or is a beneficiary under an optional
3232 retirement payment plan, to be eligible for the adjustment under
3333 this section:
3434 (A) the annuitant must be living on the effective
3535 date of the adjustment; and
3636 (B) the effective date of the retirement of the
3737 member of the retirement system must have been after August 31,
3838 2004, and on or before August 31, 2015;
3939 (2) is a beneficiary under Section 824.402(a)(3) or
4040 (4) or 824.502, to be eligible for the adjustment:
4141 (A) the annuitant must be living on the effective
4242 date of the adjustment; and
4343 (B) the date of death of the member of the
4444 retirement system must have been after August 31, 2004, and on or
4545 before August 31, 2015; or
4646 (3) is an alternate payee under Section 804.005, the
4747 annuitant is eligible for the adjustment only if the effective date
4848 of the election to receive the annuity payment was after August 31,
4949 2004, and on or before August 31, 2015.
5050 (d) An adjustment made under this section does not apply to
5151 payments under:
5252 (1) Section 824.203(d), relating to retirees who
5353 receive a standard service retirement annuity in an amount fixed by
5454 statute;
5555 (2) Section 824.304(a), relating to disability
5656 retirees with less than 10 years of service credit;
5757 (3) Section 824.304(b)(2), relating to disability
5858 retirees who receive a disability annuity in an amount fixed by
5959 statute;
6060 (4) Section 824.404(a), relating to active member
6161 survivor beneficiaries who receive a survivor annuity in an amount
6262 fixed by statute;
6363 (5) Section 824.501(a), relating to retiree survivor
6464 beneficiaries who receive a survivor annuity in an amount fixed by
6565 statute; or
6666 (6) Section 824.804(b), relating to participants in
6767 the deferred retirement option plan with regard to payments from
6868 their deferred retirement option plan accounts.
6969 (e) An adjustment under this section:
7070 (1) must be made as soon as practicable after the board
7171 of trustees finds that payment of the adjustment would not violate
7272 Section 821.006; and
7373 (2) is limited to the lesser of:
7474 (A) an amount equal to three percent of the
7575 monthly benefit subject to the increase; or
7676 (B) $100 a month.
7777 (f) The board of trustees shall determine the eligibility
7878 for and the amount of any adjustment in monthly annuities in
7979 accordance with this section.
8080 SECTION 2. (a) Using existing resources, the Teacher
8181 Retirement System of Texas shall conduct a study on the possibility
8282 of providing future cost-of-living adjustments payable to an
8383 annuitant receiving a monthly death or retirement annuity,
8484 including projections on future cost-of-living adjustments, a
8585 review of structural changes affecting cost-of-living adjustments,
8686 and the feasibility of offering an alternative annuity payment
8787 option to retirees under which the standard service retirement
8888 annuity provided under Subchapter C, Chapter 824, Government Code,
8989 is payable on a graduated scale with annuity payments increasing on
9090 an annual basis. In conducting a study under this section, the
9191 retirement system shall only consider alternative annuity payment
9292 options that are projected by the retirement system's actuary to
9393 have no fiscal impact to the state.
9494 (b) Not later than September 1, 2022, the Teacher Retirement
9595 System of Texas shall submit to the legislature a written report on
9696 the results of the study and any recommendations for legislative or
9797 other action.
9898 (c) This section expires September 1, 2023.
9999 SECTION 3. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
100100 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
101101 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
102102 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
103103 Act takes effect September 1, 2021.