Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB113 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill November 9, 2020

Engrossed

Bill April 21, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 23, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 20, 2021
Bill March 29, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 16, 2021
Fiscal Note March 28, 2021
Fiscal Note March 8, 2021

Analysis

Analysis May 15, 2021
Analysis March 29, 2021