Texas 2021 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB115 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/20/2021

                    By: Rodriguez, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Seliger) H.B. No. 115
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 13, 2021;
 April 13, 2021, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Finance; May 20, 2021, reported adversely, with favorable
 Committee Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 12, Nays 0;
 May 20, 2021, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 115 By:  Bettencourt


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the exemption from ad valorem taxation of certain
 property owned by a charitable organization and used in providing
 housing and related services to certain homeless individuals.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 11.18(p), Tax Code, is amended to read as
 follows:
 (p)  The exemption authorized by Subsection (d)(23) applies
 only to property that:
 (1)  is owned by a charitable organization that has
 been in existence for at least:
 (A)  20 [12] years if the property is located in a
 county described by Subdivision (4)(A); or
 (B)  two years if the property is located in a
 municipality described by Subdivision (4)(B);
 (2)  is located on a tract of land that:
 (A)  is at least 15 acres in size; and
 (B)  was either:
 (i)  owned by the organization on July 1,
 2021; or
 (ii)  acquired by donation and owned by the
 organization on January 1, 2023;
 (3)  is used to provide permanent housing and related
 services to individuals described by that subsection; and
 (4) [(3)]  is located [on or consists of a single
 campus] in:
 (A)  a county [municipality] with a population of
 more than one million [750,000] and less than 1.5 million; or
 (B)  a municipality with a population of more than
 100,000 and less than 150,000 at least part of which is located in a
 county with a population of less than 5,000 [850,000 or within the
 extraterritorial jurisdiction of such a municipality].
 SECTION 2.  This Act applies only to an ad valorem tax year
 that begins on or after the effective date of this Act.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect January 1, 2022.
 * * * * *