Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB115 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 05/29/2021

                            H.B. No. 115


 AN ACT
 relating to the exemption from ad valorem taxation of certain
 property owned by a charitable organization and used in providing
 housing and related services to certain homeless individuals.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 11.18(p), Tax Code, is amended to read as
 follows:
 (p)  The exemption authorized by Subsection (d)(23) applies
 only to property that:
 (1)  is owned by a charitable organization that has
 been in existence for at least:
 (A)  20 [12] years if the property is located in a
 county described by Subdivision (4)(A); or
 (B)  two years if the property is located in a
 municipality described by Subdivision (4)(B);
 (2)  is located on a tract of land that:
 (A)  is at least 15 acres in size; and
 (B)  was either:
 (i)  owned by the organization on July 1,
 2021; or
 (ii)  acquired by donation and owned by the
 organization on January 1, 2023;
 (3)  is used to provide permanent housing and related
 services to individuals described by that subsection; and
 (4) [(3)]  is located [on or consists of a single
 campus] in:
 (A)  a county [municipality] with a population of
 more than one million [750,000] and less than 1.5 million; or
 (B)  a municipality with a population of more than
 100,000 and less than 150,000 at least part of which is located in a
 county with a population of less than 5,000 [850,000 or within the
 extraterritorial jurisdiction of such a municipality].
 SECTION 2.  This Act applies only to an ad valorem tax year
 that begins on or after the effective date of this Act.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect January 1, 2022.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 115 was passed by the House on April
 13, 2021, by the following vote:  Yeas 147, Nays 0, 1 present, not
 voting; and that the House concurred in Senate amendments to H.B.
 No. 115 on May 28, 2021, by the following vote:  Yeas 140, Nays 5, 1
 present, not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 115 was passed by the Senate, with
 amendments, on May 21, 2021, by the following vote:  Yeas 31, Nays
 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 APPROVED: __________________
 Date
 __________________
 Governor