Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1153 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 15, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 23, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 19, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 12, 2021
Fiscal Note March 15, 2021

Analysis

Analysis May 12, 2021
Analysis April 7, 2021