Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1156 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 15, 2021

Engrossed

Bill May 13, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 23, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 20, 2021
Bill May 5, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 18, 2021
Fiscal Note May 1, 2021
Fiscal Note March 27, 2021

Analysis

Analysis May 17, 2021
Analysis May 5, 2021