Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1172 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1-H.B. No. 1172
1+By: Howard, et al. H.B. No. 1172
2+ (Senate Sponsor - Zaffirini, Bettencourt)
3+ (In the Senate - Received from the House April 19, 2021;
4+ April 19, 2021, read first time and referred to Committee on
5+ Criminal Justice; May 20, 2021, reported adversely, with favorable
6+ Committee Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 6, Nays 0;
7+ May 20, 2021, sent to printer.)
8+Click here to see the committee vote
9+ COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 1172 By: Huffman
210
311
12+ A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
413 AN ACT
514 relating to the rights of victims of sexual assault or other
615 prohibited sexual conduct.
716 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
817 SECTION 1. The heading to Article 15.051, Code of Criminal
918 Procedure, is amended to read as follows:
1019 Art. 15.051. [REQUIRING] POLYGRAPH EXAMINATION OF
1120 COMPLAINANT PROHIBITED.
1221 SECTION 2. Article 15.051(a), Code of Criminal Procedure,
1322 is amended to read as follows:
1423 (a) A peace officer or an attorney representing the state
1524 may not require, request, or take a polygraph examination of a
1625 person who charges or seeks to charge in a complaint the commission
1726 of an offense under Section 21.02, 21.11, 22.011, 22.021, or 25.02,
1827 Penal Code.
1928 SECTION 3. Article 56A.251(a), Code of Criminal Procedure,
2029 is amended to conform to Section 3, Chapter 1037 (H.B. 616), Acts of
2130 the 86th Legislature, Regular Session, 2019, and is further amended
2231 to read as follows:
2332 (a) If [Except as provided by Subsection (b), if] a sexual
2433 assault is reported to a law enforcement agency within 120 [96]
2534 hours after the assault, the law enforcement agency, with the
2635 consent of the victim of the alleged assault, a person authorized to
2736 act on behalf of the victim, or an employee of the Department of
2837 Family and Protective Services, shall request a forensic medical
2938 examination of the victim for use in the investigation or
3039 prosecution of the offense.
3140 SECTION 4. The heading to Subchapter H, Chapter 56A, Code of
3241 Criminal Procedure, is amended to read as follows:
3342 SUBCHAPTER H. PRESENCE OF ADVOCATE OR REPRESENTATIVE DURING
3443 FORENSIC MEDICAL EXAMINATION OR LAW ENFORCEMENT INTERVIEW
3544 SECTION 5. Subchapter H, Chapter 56A, Code of Criminal
3645 Procedure, is amended by adding Article 56A.3515 to read as
3746 follows:
3847 Art. 56A.3515. PRESENCE OF SEXUAL ASSAULT PROGRAM ADVOCATE
3948 OR OTHER VICTIM'S REPRESENTATIVE DURING LAW ENFORCEMENT INTERVIEW.
4049 (a) Before conducting an investigative interview with a victim
4150 reporting a sexual assault, other than a victim who is a minor as
4251 defined by Section 101.003, Family Code, the peace officer
4352 conducting the interview shall offer the victim the opportunity to
4453 have an advocate from a sexual assault program, as defined by
4554 Section 420.003, Government Code, be present with the victim during
4655 the interview, if the advocate is available at the time of the
4756 interview. The advocate must have completed a sexual assault
4857 training program described by Section 420.011(b), Government Code.
4958 (b) If an advocate described by Subsection (a) is not
5059 available at the time of the interview, the peace officer
5160 conducting the interview shall offer the victim the opportunity to
5261 have a crime victim liaison from the law enforcement agency, a peace
5362 officer who has completed a sexual assault training program
5463 described by Section 420.011(b), Government Code, or a victim's
5564 assistance counselor from a state or local agency or other entity be
5665 present with the victim during the interview.
5766 (b-1) The peace officer conducting an investigative
5867 interview described by Subsection (a) shall make a good faith
5968 effort to comply with Subsections (a) and (b), except that the
6069 officer's compliance with those subsections may not unreasonably
6170 delay or otherwise impede the interview process.
6271 (c) An advocate, liaison, officer, or counselor authorized
6372 to be present during an interview under this article may only
6473 provide the victim reporting the sexual assault with:
6574 (1) counseling and other support services; and
6675 (2) information regarding the rights of crime victims
6776 under Subchapter B.
6877 (d) The advocate, liaison, officer, or counselor and the
6978 sexual assault program or other entity providing the advocate,
7079 liaison, officer, or counselor may not delay or otherwise impede
7180 the interview process.
7281 (e) A sexual assault program providing an advocate under
7382 Subsection (a) shall pay all costs associated with providing the
7483 advocate. An entity providing a victim's assistance counselor
7584 under Subsection (b) shall pay all costs associated with providing
7685 the counselor.
7786 (f) A peace officer or law enforcement agency that provides
7887 an advocate, liaison, officer, or counselor with access to a victim
7988 reporting a sexual assault is not subject to civil or criminal
8089 liability for providing that access.
8190 SECTION 6. Article 56A.352, Code of Criminal Procedure, is
8291 amended by amending Subsections (b) and (d) and adding Subsection
8392 (b-1) to read as follows:
8493 (b) If a victim alleging to have sustained injuries as the
8594 victim of a sexual assault was confined in a penal institution at
8695 the time of the alleged assault, the penal institution shall
8796 provide, at the victim's request, a representative to be present
8897 with the victim:
8998 (1) at any forensic medical examination conducted for
9099 the purpose of collecting and preserving evidence related to the
91100 investigation or prosecution of the alleged assault; and
92101 (2) during an investigative interview conducted by a
93102 peace officer in relation to the investigation of the alleged
94103 assault.
95104 (b-1) The representative provided by the penal institution
96105 under Subsection (b) must:
97106 (1) be approved by the penal institution; and
98107 (2) be a:
99108 (A) psychologist;
100109 (B) sociologist;
101110 (C) chaplain;
102111 (D) social worker;
103112 (E) case manager; or
104113 (F) volunteer who has completed a sexual assault
105114 training program described by Section 420.011(b), Government Code.
106115 (d) A representative may not delay or otherwise impede:
107116 (1) the screening or stabilization of an emergency
108117 medical condition; or
109118 (2) the interview process.
110119 SECTION 7. The following provisions of the Code of Criminal
111120 Procedure are repealed:
112121 (1) Articles 15.051(b) and (c); and
113122 (2) Article 56A.251(b).
114123 SECTION 8. To the extent of any conflict, this Act prevails
115124 over another Act of the 87th Legislature, Regular Session, 2021,
116125 relating to nonsubstantive additions to and corrections in enacted
117126 codes.
118127 SECTION 9. This Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
119- ______________________________ ______________________________
120- President of the Senate Speaker of the House
121- I certify that H.B. No. 1172 was passed by the House on April
122- 15, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 146, Nays 0, 1 present, not
123- voting; and that the House concurred in Senate amendments to H.B.
124- No. 1172 on May 28, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 147, Nays 0,
125- 1 present, not voting.
126- ______________________________
127- Chief Clerk of the House
128- I certify that H.B. No. 1172 was passed by the Senate, with
129- amendments, on May 22, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 29, Nays
130- 1.
131- ______________________________
132- Secretary of the Senate
133- APPROVED: __________________
134- Date
135- __________________
136- Governor
128+ * * * * *