Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB119 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill November 9, 2020

Engrossed

Bill March 25, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 4, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note April 29, 2021
Fiscal Note April 24, 2021
Fiscal Note April 20, 2021
Fiscal Note March 8, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill April 26, 2021
Bill March 22, 2021

Analysis

Analysis April 22, 2021
Analysis April 19, 2021
Analysis March 19, 2021