Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1193 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 19, 2021

Engrossed

Bill May 5, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 29, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 22, 2021
Bill March 30, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 21, 2021
Fiscal Note March 20, 2021
Fiscal Note March 12, 2021

Analysis

Analysis May 20, 2021
Analysis March 30, 2021